Table of Contents
Chief Ministers of Bihar
On August 10, 2020, Tejashwi Yadav was sworn in as the state’s Deputy Chief Minister, while Nitish Kumar was sworn in as the state’s Chief Minister for the eighth time. After Nitish Kumar’s Janata Dal (U) joined forces with Tejashwi Yadav’s Rashtriya Janata Dal to create a government, both leaders came together. The Governor is the de facto executive head of the state under the Indian Constitution, but the Chief Minister is the de jure head.
In its history, Bihar has had 23 Chief Ministers. Sri Krishna Sinha served as Bihar’s first chief minister. He has been the chief minister of Bihar for 14 years and 304 days. The CM of Bihar with the shortest tenure, Satish Prasad Singh, served for five days in 1968.
List of Prime Minister of India
List of Chief Ministers(CM) of Bihar
Here’s the complete List of Chief Ministers of Bihar from 1947 to 2022:
Sl. No. |
Chief Ministers |
From |
To |
1 | Krishna Singh | Apr 2, 1946 | Jan 31, 1961 |
2 | Deep Narayan Singh | Feb 1, 1961 | Feb 18, 1961 |
3 | Binodanand Jha | Feb 18, 1961 | Oct 2, 1963 |
4 | K. B. Sahay | Oct 2, 1963 | Mar 5, 1967 |
5 | Mahamaya Prasad Sinha | Mar 5, 1967 | Jan 28, 1968 |
6 | Satish Prasad Singh | Jan 28, 1968 | Feb 1, 1968 |
7 | B. P. Mandal | Feb 1, 1968 | Mar 2, 1968 |
8 | Bhola Paswan Shastri | Mar 22, 1968 | Jun 29, 1968 |
President’s rule | Jun 29, 1968 | Feb 26, 1969 | |
9 | Harihar Singh | Feb 26, 1969 | Jun 22, 1969 |
10 | Bhola Paswan Shastri | Jun 22, 1969 | Jul 4, 1969 |
President’s rule | Jul 6, 1969 | Feb 16, 1970 | |
11 | Daroga Prasad Rai | 16 February. 1970 | Dec 22, 1970 |
12 | Karpoori Thakur | Dec 22, 1970 | Jun 2, 1971 |
13 | Bhola Paswan Shastri | Jun 2, 1971 | Jan 9, 1972 |
President’s rule | Jan 9, 1972 | Mar 19, 1972 | |
14 | Kedar Pandey | Mar 19, 1972 | Jul 2, 1973 |
15 | Abdul Gafoor | Jul 2, 1973 | Apr 11, 1975 |
16 | Jagannath Mishra | Apr 11, 1975 | Apr 30, 1977 |
President’s rule | Apr 30, 1977 | Jun 24, 1977 | |
17 | Karpoori Thakur | Jun 24, 1977 | Apr 21, 1979 |
18 | Ram Sundar Das | Apr 21, 1979 | Feb 17, 1980 |
President’s rule | Feb 17, 1980 | Jun 8, 1980 | |
19 | Jagannath Mishra | Jun 8, 1980 | Aug 14, 1983 |
20 | Chandrashekhar Singh | Aug 14, 1983 | Mar 12, 1985 |
21 | Bindeshwari Dubey | Mar 12, 1985 | Feb 13, 1988 |
22 | Bhagwat Jha Azad | Feb 14, 1988 | Mar 10, 1989 |
23 | Satyendra Narayan Sinha | Mar 11, 1989 | Dec 6, 1989 |
24 | Jagannath Mishra | Dec 6, 1989 | Mar 10, 1990 |
25 | Lalu Prasad Yadav | Mar 10, 1990 | Mar 28, 1995 |
President’s rule | Mar 28, 1995 | Apr 4, 1995 | |
26 | Lalu Prasad Yadav | Apr 4, 1995 | Jul 25, 1997 |
27 | Rabri Devi | Jul 25, 1997 | Feb 11, 1999 |
President’s rule | Feb 11, 1999 | Mar 9, 1999 | |
28 | Rabri Devi | Mar 9, 1999 | Mar 2, 2000 |
29 | Nitish Kumar | Mar 3, 2000 | Mar 10, 2000 |
30 | Rabri Devi | Mar 11, 2000 | Mar 6, 2005 |
President’s rule | Mar 7, 2005 | Nov 24, 2005 | |
31 | Nitish Kumar | Nov 24, 2005 | May 20, 2014 |
32 | Jitan Ram Manjhi | May 20, 2014 | Feb 22, 2015 |
33 | Nitish Kumar | Feb 22, 2015 | Nov 20, 2015 |
34 | Nitish Kumar | Nov 20, 2015 | Nov 16, 2020 |
35 | Nitish Kumar | Nov 16, 2020 | Present |
Chief Ministers of Bihar Facts for UPSC
- After Lalu Prasad Yadav, the former chief minister of Bihar, was found guilty in the Fodder Scam in 1997, his wife Rabri Devi was appointed to the position.
- Together, Rabri Devi and Lalu Prasad Yadav ruled Bihar for about 15 years.
- To elect members of the Bihar Legislative Assembly, the 2020 Bihar Legislative Assembly Election ran from October 28, 2020, to November 7, 2020.
- Nitish Kumar has been in office as the incumbent since 22 February 2015.
- Nitish Kumar took the oath of office and was sworn in as chief minister for the eighth time on August 10, 2022.
List of Vice Presidents of India
Chief Ministers of Bihar: FAQs
Q Who is the 1 Chief Minister of Bihar?
Ans. Sri Krishna Sinha is the first Chief Minister of Bihar. His tenure was from Apr 2, 1946 to 31 Jan 1961
Q Who is the present vice Chief Minister of Bihar?
Ans. Present vice Chief Minister of Bihar Tejashwi Yadav since 10 August 2022
Q Who is IN power IN Bihar?
Ans. Political parties are Rashtriya Janata Dal (RJD) and Janata Dal (United) (JDU) are in power in Bihar
Q Who is the governor of Bihar 2022?
Ans. Phagu Chauhan is the current governor of Bihar.
Q Who is the first lady Chief Minister of Bihar?
Ans. Rabri Devi was appointed as Bihar’s first female chief minister on July 25, 1997, when her husband Lalu Prasad Yadav was compelled to resign because an arrest warrant had been issued for him in connection with the Fodder scam.
Major Incidents in Indian History
- Quit India Movement
- Chauri Chaura Incident
- Jallianwala Bagh Massacre
- Green Revolution in India
- Non-Cooperation Movement
Famous Personalities Biography
Mangal Pandey |
Maharana Pratap |
Rabindranath Tagore |
Bhagat Singh |
Jyotiba Phule |
Satyendra Nath Bose |
Raja Ram Mohan Roy |
Subhash Chandra Bose |